HARROGATE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 515127
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 June 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 June 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 09 September 2018 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 09 September 2018 101 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 04 December 2017 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 04 December 2017 187 days late Download