Trustees YORK SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 515145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lily Victoria Rowntree Chair 01 July 2017
None on record
Katherine Ann Thurlow Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record
Joseph Alwyn Wilson Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Nigel Bartram Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Rachael Ann Daggett Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
Ros Roberts Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
Julie Purcell Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
Janet Elizabeth Haley Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Charlotte Jane Trueman Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Andrew Paul Smith Trustee 01 July 2000
None on record
Mary Luker Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF YORK MUSIC CENTRE
Received: On time