Trustees FRIENDS OF ROSENDALE PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1186474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca KENDALL | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marie Pastore | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Taryn Jessica Rea | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Wollaston | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly Ellen Hardman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Thornton Rodway | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tamsyn Hanrahan | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Patel Buglass | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Clarkin | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Whinder | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.