Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TADLEY

Charity number: 1187062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Richard John StClair Harlow Chair 01 September 2013
None on record
Darren Paul Allwright Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Sally Carolyn Sinclair Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Gloria Anne Bailey Trustee 09 November 2019
TADLEY SCOUT GROUP
Recently registered
Sandra Mary Phelps Trustee 09 November 2019
None on record
Simon Charles Day Trustee 01 May 2019
HOMES FOR THE HOMELESS (LEICESTERSHIRE) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CARPENTER'S ARMS (MIDLANDS) TRUST
Received: On time
Victoria Christine Ellingsen Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Susan Amanda Cobb Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Stephen Andrew McKay Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
ANDREW JOSEPH COBB Trustee 01 April 2016
CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOLDIERS', SAILORS' & AIRMEN'S CLUBS
Received: On time
JOHN PYNN Trustee 23 April 2015
NEWBURY AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Deanne Margaret Wagstaff Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
Rev CATHERINE PYNN Trustee 23 April 2014
None on record
Kayla Harlow Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Jean Kyle Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
John Bryan Watson Trustee 01 April 2006
None on record
MARY CHRISTINE WATSON Trustee 01 April 2006
None on record
Jane Pitfield Trustee 01 April 2000
None on record
Rev Patricia Valerie Brown Trustee 01 July 1998
None on record