Financial history KING JAMES'S SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 515466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.39m £910.74k £929.55k £596.13k £407.88k
Total expenditure £1.27m £756.91k £875.61k £474.53k £304.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £5.53k £3.98k £3.57k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £23.87k £31.12k £24.88k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.39m £881.33k £894.45k £567.68k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.27m £756.91k £875.61k £474.53k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A