Trustees PORT TALBOT HARRIERS & ATHLETIC CLUB
Charity number: 1190491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Williams | Chair | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Westley Sheldon | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Hayden | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cathryn Williams | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Howard | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon David | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Lowery | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Davies | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rees | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liane Keris Thomas | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Harwood | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernard John Henderson | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Kingsland | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.