NOTTINGHAM LAW CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 515776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £566.94k £514.08k £528.82k £586.77k £723.14k
Total expenditure £531.18k £498.43k £532.56k £546.02k £660.47k
Income from government contracts £424.98k £401.77k £256.71k £350.15k £486.14k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £188.46k £146.50k £121.03k
Income - Donations and legacies £39.54k £14.00k £5.13k £5.92k £3.41k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £527.27k £500.06k £522.31k £580.86k £719.71k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £122 £22 £0 £0 £17
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.38k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £531.18k £498.43k £532.56k £546.02k £660.47k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £21.70k £17.59k £7.72k £17.99k £10.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0