NOTTINGHAM LAW CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 515776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maggie Grimshaw Trustee 15 May 2017 None on record
SANDRA PINK Trustee None on record
Ben Talbot Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record
MARK KELLEY Trustee 09 January 2012 None on record
Daniela Scotece Trustee 15 May 2017 None on record
Callum Scott Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
SIMON DAVID LEACH LLB HONS Trustee None on record
Judy Tate Trustee
THE GREENFIELDS CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time
ANDREW WESLEY Chair 09 January 2012 None on record
Mark Keeley Trustee 19 September 2016 None on record