Accounts and annual returns CAMBRIAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR DEAF CHILDREN IN WALES

Charity number: 515848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required