Trustees MONTGOMERYSHIRE YOUTH THEATRE
Charity number: 516040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Bellamy | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Duncan | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE WYNN SHEPPARD | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Williams | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN LUNT | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|||||
ANGELA CORBETT | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.