Trustees ASHREIGNEY VILLAGE HALL - CIO
Charity number: 1190674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Reed Partridge | Chair | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Basey-Fisher | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Tillyer | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Keith Scott | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Worsfold | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Oarton | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Oarton | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Desmond Helyer | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Parfitt | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mitchell | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.