Governing document Lake District Music Limited
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 APRIL 2010. as amended on 27 Apr 2018 as amended on 28 Feb 2020 as amended on 30 Apr 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC AND THE OTHER ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO ENCOURAGE BY MEANS OF SUMMER SCHOOLS AND FESTIVALS IN THE LAKE DISTRICT AND ELSEWHERE THE STUDY PERFORMANCE KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING (BUT NO LIMITED TO) MUSIC OPERA BALLET MIME DRAMA CINEMA LITERATURE AND THE VISUAL ARTS AND TO FURMULATE PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.