WOODHALL SPA CORONATION HALL TRUST

Charity number: 517086
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £44.10k £46.18k £21.87k £20.62k £26.02k
Total expenditure £18.52k £26.53k £17.13k £20.87k £17.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A