Dogfen lywodraethu MIRUS - WALES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/07/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE IN WALES WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO A LEARNING DISABILITY, A MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, OLD AGE, DEPENDENCE ON DRUGS OR ALCOHOL, HOMELESSNESS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OR ANY OTHER VULNERABILITY OR DISADVANTAGE, IN ORDER TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE FULFILLED, VALUED LIVES, BY (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY): (A) PROVIDING CARE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, ACCOMMODATION, AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; (B) SUPPORTING PEOPLE THROUGH REHABILITATION AND RE-ENABLEMENT; (C) SUPPORTING THE CARERS WHO ARE HELPING SUCH PERSONS WITHIN AND OUTSIDE THE HOME; AND (D) PROVIDING TRAINING AND ADVISORY SERVICES FOR ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS UNDERTAKING ACTIVITIES THAT FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FALLING WITHIN THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF SOUTH GLAMORGAN
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.