SOUTH YORKSHIRE ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 517441
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.04k £29.17k £32.19k £33.24k £28.64k
Total expenditure £34.92k £44.64k £51.52k £39.52k £23.36k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £11.33k