Trustees KINDNESS COUNTS UK

Charity number: 1195961
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michelle Ann Atherton Chair 29 June 2019
None on record
chynalouise courtney Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Deborah Brown Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Andrea Dawn Kay Trustee 20 June 2022
DOHERTY'S DESTINY LIMITED
Received: On time
Pauline Hernen Trustee 29 April 2022
None on record
Mark Spragg Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Darren James Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Karen Murphy Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Callum Baxter Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Paul David Bunney Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
David Bannister Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record