Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S CHARLBURY WITH ALL SAINTS SHORTHAMPTON
Charity number: 1193530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Fergus Butler Gallie | Chair | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lewis Heckman | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Louise Fairhurst | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Louise Hanks | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN MORLEY SUMMERS | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Judith Cooper | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Anna Jenkins | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Barnett | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|||||
John Hargadine Glasgow | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Welsh | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helene Provstgaard | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jeffrey Durrant | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Kinahan Vernon-Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Jane Partington | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY GALLAGHER | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH BENTALL | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK GALLAGHER | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ROY SCOTT | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Janice Fielden | Trustee | 01 October 2005 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.