Trustees Layton Methodist Church
Charity number: 1194986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark John Walmsley | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Halstead | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Margaret Crook | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Peter Crook | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Lesley Walmsley | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helene Lynne Pickup | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Macaulay Waddington | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ellen Pritchard | Trustee | 05 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Robert Leslie Brookes | Trustee | 22 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Helen Jepson | Trustee | 19 September 2005 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elaine Leach B. Ed. | Trustee | 19 September 2005 |
|
|
||||
David Roger Leach | Trustee | 19 September 2005 |
|
|||||
Joanne Alice Walmsley | Trustee | 19 September 2005 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ruth Sellers | Trustee | 19 September 2005 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.