Trustees MARTIN HOUSE
Charity number: 517919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Shiela Clare Puri | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jayne Price | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Ann McKinney | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Singer | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Straughan | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rifhat MaIik | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER SLEE | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JAMES HALSTEAD | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOSEPH PAUL MILLINGTON | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZOE SANDRA DONALDSON | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN STEPHEN PLEWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENNY WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.