Financial history MADRASSA ZIA-UL OURAN

Charity number: 518022
Charity reporting is overdue by 143 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £155.97k £169.86k £126.45k £128.59k £108.95k
Total expenditure £113.43k £101.28k £99.54k £105.32k £89.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k