Financial history INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BLACKBURN TRUST FUND

Charity number: 518352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.78k £496 £1.10k £501 £276
Total expenditure £1.28k £150 £600 £275 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A