ROCK PARK ESTATE

Charity number: 518573
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £53 £270 £261 £74 £119
Total expenditure £9.15k £50 £0 £1.00k £0