Governing document FRIENDS OF LANCASHIRE ARCHIVES
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/03/1987 AS AMENDED ON 25/09/1989 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/2012 as amended on 17 Sep 2019 as amended on 27 Oct 2020 as amended on 20 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE THE ARCHIVAL HERITAGE OF THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THAT COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE AND FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF LANCASHIRE ARCHIVES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.