WORCESTERSHIRE HOSPITALS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 518895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £148.50k £322.06k £40.43k £766 £894
Total expenditure £36.13k £297.41k £18.47k £1.78k £1.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A