Trustees THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY AND UNDIVIDED TRINITY OF NORWICH
Charity number: 1201015
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Revd Andrew Braddock | Chair | 28 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Julie Marie Boyd | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sir Nicholas Hickman Ponsonby Bacon Bt KCVO | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
PROFESSOR ELIZABETH ANNE WIGGINS | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
TIMOTHY JOHN PROCTER | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
MARIE LYSE NUMUHOZA | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev PETER MICHAEL DOLL | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Andrew Watts Bryant | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Aidan Stephen George Platten | Trustee | 24 September 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.