Financial history COLSTERWORTH AND DISTRICT YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 519156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.80k £4.85k £4.98k £5.11k £5.41k
Total expenditure £2.92k £4.31k £2.09k £3.00k £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A