HOWGILL FAMILY CENTRE

Charity number: 519278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.34m £1.30m £1.36m £1.40m £1.46m
Total expenditure £1.41m £1.43m £1.37m £1.41m £1.42m
Income from government contracts £1.06m £949.74k £980.58k £982.40k £687.33k
Income from government grants £15.91k £158.87k £175.66k £217.10k £88.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.80k £12.30k £14.33k £20.63k £19.49k
Income - Other trading activities £88.08k £0 £514 £0 £92.70k
Income - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.21m £1.25m £1.26m £1.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £243 £213 £70 £283 £710
Income - Other £0 £78.58k £100.97k £117.56k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.41m £1.43m £1.37m £1.40m £1.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £718 £0 £4.86k £13.15k £8.90k
Expenditure - Governance £381.77k £5.10k £6.00k £5.58k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0