BARNOLDSWICK SENIORS POP-IN

Charity number: 519534
Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 322 days
Annual return 30 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 688 days
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 688 days
Annual return 30 December 2017 09 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 December 2015 25 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2015 Not Required