BARNOLDSWICK SENIORS POP-IN

Charity number: 519534
Charity reporting is overdue by 696 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/12/2013 30/12/2014 30/12/2015 30/12/2016 30/12/2017
Total gross income £12.29k £12.73k £13.38k £10.49k £8.65k
Total expenditure £9.29k £9.84k £8.99k £8.99k £5.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A