Accounts and annual returns BELAN OLD SCHOOL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 519839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 January 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required