Trustees BOWES BELLES WI

Charity number: 1199378
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Watson Chair 13 June 2013
None on record
Marie Miley Trustee 06 July 2021
None on record
CHRISTINE PARKER Trustee 11 April 2017
THE FRIENDS OF WASHINGTON OLD HALL
Received: On time
Gillian Cain Trustee 14 February 2017
None on record
Shirley Raad Trustee 14 June 2016
None on record
Debra Ritchie Trustee 11 March 2014
None on record
Judith Russell Trustee 06 June 2013
THE TYNE AND WEAR SOUTH FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: On time