Financial history Trafford Sea Cadets

Charity number: 520003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £59.41k £29.76k £21.88k £29.37k £53.55k
Total expenditure £60.63k £29.32k £20.23k £30.32k £23.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £24.26k