Financial history EGERTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 520073
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £214.62k £197.34k £251.23k £276.76k £218.21k
Total expenditure £214.27k £196.40k £170.75k £257.33k £222.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £56.57k