Trustees BUXTON UNIT 497 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 520426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN FISHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Caroline Ardern | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kiri Jones | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Davies | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave O'Donnell | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Adrian West | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Davis | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ATTWOOD DAVIS | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.