Financial history THE CHESTERFIELD MINERS' WELFARE FUND SOCIETY

Charity number: 520431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £889 £912 £925 £939 £4.48k
Total expenditure £395 £495 £395 £395 £425
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A