CLAY CROSS AND DANESMOOR RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 520437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.54k £3.48k £3.99k £4.10k £2.57k
Total expenditure £29.52k £31.76k £33.49k £33.01k £29.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A