NEW TUPTON MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 520487
Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 39 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 39 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 404 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 404 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 770 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 770 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1135 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1135 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1500 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1500 days