Accounts and annual returns STAVELEY MINERS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 520522
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window