VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2021 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2021 262 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 October 2021 628 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 October 2021 628 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 October 2021 993 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 October 2021 993 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 October 2021 1358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1458 days