Financial history SEAHAM UNIT 299 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 520569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £29.95k £27.32k £14.70k £9.96k £14.40k
Total expenditure £48.74k £24.99k £17.80k £10.05k £5.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.64k £700 N/A N/A £10.00k