Trustees 27TH DERBY (CHADDEDEN) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 520623
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT HORSLEY | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roger Selby | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Marie Hollingshurst | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Robin Hollingshurst | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Stone Parent | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Chater | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Janet Bale | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Roy Stevenson | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Debbie Kerry | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Christopher Wood | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE WOOD | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE FEARN - DAGLISH | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY HOWARTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN MARRIOTT AGSL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.