THE 1ST RIPLEY GROUP BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 520671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Gration Trustee 12 June 2021 None on record
RONALD ASHTON Trustee 09 July 2012
THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE RIPLEY HOSPITAL Received: On time
PAUL AULT Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
Michael Bird Trustee 12 June 2021 None on record
JULIE ANN AULT Trustee 14 March 2018 None on record
Rothwell Ogden Trustee 05 August 2020 None on record
Michael Hawley Trustee 31 January 2020 None on record
DAVID HAWLEY Trustee 10 May 2017 None on record