Accounts and annual returns ACCRINGTON AND DISTRICT UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required