Trustees ACCRINGTON AND DISTRICT UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 521003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN HUTCHINSON BEM I.ENG | Chair | 12 March 1995 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Gruber | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Beswick | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Hartley | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ibrahim | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rawden Kerr | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Candice Davies | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Gerken | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.