Trustees CITY OF LIVERPOOL UNIT (217) OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 521175
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin James | Chair | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Clarke | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Lewis | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Johnston | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Branfield | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROL PAGETT | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.