St. Paul's Church Walkden Community Centre

Charity number: 521359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.67k £14.95k £13.11k £10.83k £4.36k
Total expenditure £10.40k £10.82k £8.16k £29.35k £11.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A