1ST ABRAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.73k £8.94k £9.33k £12.61k £13.89k
Total expenditure £5.28k £6.49k £7.21k £7.89k £9.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.54k