Financial history 35TH LANCASTER (ST JOSEPH'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.01k £11.12k £6.16k £6.52k £26.60k
Total expenditure £6.42k £8.45k £6.62k £1.35k £5.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.27k