Trustees 1ST THORNTON-CLEVELEYS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 521682

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevan Smart | Chair | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wyatt | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elouise Frances Pelham | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Lauren Rigby | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Campbell | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Smart | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Hill | Trustee | 30 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wright | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Michelle Minshull | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.