Trustees WIGAN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gerard Alfred Davies Chair 12 June 2017
None on record
David Norman Finch Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record
Stephen James Morrell Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record
Stewart Thompson Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record
Eric Joseph Walter Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record
ANDREW CONNELLAN Trustee 08 June 2015
16TH WIGAN SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
LEWIS WILLIAM FOSTER Trustee 08 December 2014
None on record
RACHEL JANE PICTON Trustee 20 January 2014
None on record
CHRISTINE ANN THOMPSON Trustee 13 December 2013
None on record
JEFFREY SEAN PICTON Trustee 17 October 2013
None on record
PAUL GREEN Trustee 17 October 2013
None on record
STEWART THOMPSON Trustee 26 October 2012
None on record
Joan Smith Trustee 13 November 2011
None on record
JOAN HAYTON Trustee
BISPHAM HALL SCOUT ESTATE
Received: On time
ALLAN FOSTER Trustee
None on record
JOHN BILSBOROUGH Trustee
None on record
JACQUELINE ANN ASPINALL Trustee
None on record
MARGARET DAVIES Trustee
None on record
PETER HART Trustee
None on record